Global Patent Index - EP 0892100 B1

EP 0892100 B1 2002-09-25 - Mechanism for controlling the reed beating position and loom with such a mechanism

Title (en)

Mechanism for controlling the reed beating position and loom with such a mechanism

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Änderung der Anschlagstellung eines Webblattes und Webmaschine mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour modifier la position de battage d'un peigne ainsi qu'un métier à tisser équipé d'un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0892100 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810502 A

Priority

EP 97810502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892100A1] The mechanism is used to adjust the set up position of a reed, at a loom. The mechanism has an electric drive linked to the reed swing axis through a gearing and-or a kinetic chain (14) transmission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 39/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 39/22 (2006.01); D03D 49/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 39/226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892100 A1 19990120; EP 0892100 B1 20020925; DE 59708329 D1 20021031; JP H1143848 A 19990216; US 6065503 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100717

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708329

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708329 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990817

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI