Global Patent Index - EP 0892123 A3

EP 0892123 A3 2000-06-07 - Beam, in particular hollow polygonal section made from extruded light metal alloys, and building set comprising such beams

Title (en)

Beam, in particular hollow polygonal section made from extruded light metal alloys, and building set comprising such beams

Title (de)

Träger, insbesondere ein aus einer Leichtmetallegierung stranggespresstes Hohlprofil eckigen Querschnitts, und Bausatz aus derartigen Trägern

Title (fr)

Poutre, en particulier profilé polygonal creux en alliage léger extrudé, et ensemble de construction comprenant ces poutres

Publication

EP 0892123 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810621 A

Priority

  • DE 19731028 A
  • DE 19735830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892123A2] The supports comprise extruded hollow profiled sections (10-13) of rectangular cross-section of different cross-sectional length and width with the cross-sectional length of one hollow section corresponding to the cross sectional width of the associated other hollow section. The ratio of length to width is between 1.2 and 2.4 At least two opposite profiled sides (18,19) each have a pair of rear cut longitudinal grooves (28) and each groove adjoins a channel-like profiled cavity (24,40) associated with each profiled corner (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/32 (2006.01); E04C 3/06 (2006.01); F16S 3/02 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/06 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892123 A2 19990120; EP 0892123 A3 20000607; EP 0892123 B1 20041222; AT 285498 T 20050115; JP H1181553 A 19990326; US 6195953 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812402 P 20050127

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BUILDING SET COMPRISING A BEAM WITH A HOLLOW POLYGONAL SECTION MADE FROM EXTRUDED LIGHT METAL ALLOYS

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001207

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI