Global Patent Index - EP 0892137 B1

EP 0892137 B1 2002-09-11 - Fitting with faceplate for a door, window, or similar

Title (en)

Fitting with faceplate for a door, window, or similar

Title (de)

Stulpschienenbeschlag für eine Tür, ein Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure avec une têtière pour une porte, une fenêtre, ou similaires

Publication

EP 0892137 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106676 A

Priority

DE 29712614 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892137A2] The guard rail (3) is connected to a holding component which fixes it in the groove (2). The holding component has at least one, and particularly two laterally extending projections (10), which engage on the side surfaces (13) of the groove, fixing the holding component in the groove. The holding component is suspended in the guard rail, particularly in lateral recesses (12), and at least partly engages around the rail. The holding component is a spring unit (5). It is U-shaped, and its free ends (9) are angled and face one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/22; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/004 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712614 U1 19980319; AT 223994 T 20020915; EP 0892137 A2 19990120; EP 0892137 A3 19990630; EP 0892137 B1 20020911; ES 2179395 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRETSCH-UNITAS G.M.B.H. BAUBESCHLAGE

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060412

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060412

2005-05-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030926

2004-02-18 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179395 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805485 20021017

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223994 T 20020915

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI