Global Patent Index - EP 0892175 B1

EP 0892175 B1 2002-09-25 - Fluid-powered cylinder

Title (en)

Fluid-powered cylinder

Title (de)

Druckmittelbetätigbarer Arbeitszylinder

Title (fr)

Vérin à fluide sous pression

Publication

EP 0892175 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890180 A

Priority

AT 121197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892175A1] The working cylinder (1) has a cylinder tube (3) with piston (4) and pressure medium connection (2). The piston contains a servo valve (9), which opens into the opposite cylinder space (8) when the supplied pressure medium exceeds a certain pressure level. A locking part (18) blocks the valve over part of the piston stroke. The part has a finger-shaped closure element (19) to block the valve intake opening (12). The finger element is spring-loaded, and has a sealing element (22) acting with the valve intake like a valve seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/149 (2013.01); F15B 15/1433 (2013.01); F15B 15/1447 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892175 A1 19990120; EP 0892175 B1 20020925; DE 59805662 D1 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805662 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

1999-11-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

1999-11-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR IT SE

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER HYDRAULIK GMBH

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI