Global patent index - EP 0892232 A3

EP 0892232 A3 2001-02-07 - Wooden barrel fridge

Title (en)

Wooden barrel fridge

Title (de)

Holzfasskühlschrank

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur en forme de tonneau en bois

Publication

EP 0892232 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98600012 A

Priority

GR 97100278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892232A2] The barrel fridge consists of the outer barrel (1) from chestnut wood, with inner stainless bucket (3), polyourethanes insulation (2), flow tap (5) and mouth with air filter-lid (4), with ventilation pipes (7) and sulphurous liquid (6) and it's fixed on case base (18), inside which there are the cooling machine and its accessories. The barrel (1) and the base-case (18) are painted and polished in the same tint of wood. The barrel fridge can also have polyaethylanium sack inside, suitable for foods, instead of the stainless bucket (3), partitions so that different varieties of wine can be placed into it and can open a horizontal partition, while an electronic plaque can regulate the temperature and the fullness of the content. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 31/00; B67D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 31/00 (2006.01); F25D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 31/006 (2013.01); F25D 11/00 (2013.01); F25D 2331/802 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892232 A2 19990120; EP 0892232 A3 20010207; GR 1002906 B 19980512

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR IT

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990225

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI