Global patent index - EP 0892371 A3

EP 0892371 A3 2000-01-12 - An apparatus for validating sheets

Title (en)

An apparatus for validating sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kontrollieren von Papier

Title (fr)

Appareil de validation de feuilles

Publication

EP 0892371 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305397 A

Priority

GB 9715084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892371A2] A self-service deposit terminal (10) is arranged to validate deposited bank notes. Each note (38) is individually transported past an interferometer (36) which is connected to a control unit (46). The output of the control unit (46) is input into a data processing means (26) which generates a value indicative of the surface roughness of the bank note. The value of roughness is compared with at least one stored reference value for genuine notes. The data processing means determines either solely on this comparison, or in conjunction with the output from a further validation means, whether the tested note is invalid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01); G07D 7/18 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07D 7/18 (2013.01); G07F 19/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892371 A2 19990120; EP 0892371 A3 20000112; GB 9715084 D0 19970924; JP H1186075 A 19990330; ZA 9806331 B 20000117

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020826

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI