Global Patent Index - EP 0892373 A3

EP 0892373 A3 2000-08-16 - Equipment for cash box, of the type with money collection rolling basket, aiming at protecting and dispensing bank notes, particularly for banking companies and post offices

Title (en)

Equipment for cash box, of the type with money collection rolling basket, aiming at protecting and dispensing bank notes, particularly for banking companies and post offices

Title (de)

Geldkassettenanlage des Typs mit Münzsammeltrommel zum Schützen und Ausgeben von Geldscheinen insbesondere für Banken und Postämter

Title (fr)

Installation à cassette pour argent liquide du type à tambour de collection de monnaie pour la protection et la distribution de billets de banque, en particulier pour banques et postes

Publication

EP 0892373 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98113484 A

Priority

IT TV970097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892373A2] Equipment for cash box, of the type with money collection rolling basket, aiming at protecting and dispensing bank notes, particularly for Banking Companies and Post Offices, comprising a protection chassis, inside of which a turntable is pivoted, supported by the corresponding internal walls, consisting of a single vertical wheel placed on the side, moved by a suitable gearmotor group fed by the mains with eventual auxiliary means, and in which along the perimeter and orthogonally respect to said wheel some oscillating money collection misaligned compartments are freely fulcrumed, said compartments being able to be arranged, depending on the information supplied by a control and activation logic unit, in correspondence of a mouthpiece, placed on the chassis upper part, provided with an eventually time openable gate, and vice versa. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00; E05G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01); E05G 1/06 (2006.01); E05G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0006 (2013.01); E05G 1/06 (2013.01); E05G 5/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892373 A2 19990120; EP 0892373 A3 20000816; IT 1294144 B1 19990322; IT TV970097 A1 19990118

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20130424

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071214

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000104

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI