Global patent index - EP 0892379 A3

EP 0892379 A3 2000-01-12 - Method and telematic equipment for gathering and broadcasting relevant traffic information

Title (en)

Method and telematic equipment for gathering and broadcasting relevant traffic information

Title (de)

Verfahren und Telematikgerät zum Erstellen und Aussenden von verkehrsrelevanten Daten

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de télématique pour élaborer et diffuser des informations de circulation significatives

Publication

EP 0892379 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111702 A

Priority

DE 19730794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892379A2] The data are created on board the vehicle using sensors (7) and with a position information and are transmitted to a central control. The data are evaluated and are used to create traffic reports. The traffic reports are received with a receiver (2) in the vehicle and are stored according to type and location Before transmission of the data to the central office, the data are compared w.r.t. the current position with the content of the stored traffic reports. Only data are send to the central office which are not contained in the stored data or show a change regarding the stored data. The traffic reports are transmitted in a standardised code and stored. The data from the sensors is assigned to corresponding sections of the coded traffic report and the current position of the vehicle is compared with the location provided in the traffic report.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01; G08G 1/127; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096791 (2013.01); G08G 1/0112 (2013.01); G08G 1/0133 (2013.01); G08G 1/0141 (2013.01); G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892379 A2 19990120; EP 0892379 A3 20000112; EP 0892379 B1 20030827; DE 19730794 A1 19990121; JP 4778129 B2 20110921; JP H1173594 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150804

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140625

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59809388

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031002

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI