Global Patent Index - EP 0892381 A3

EP 0892381 A3 2000-05-24 - Method and telematic equipment for determining traffic information

Title (en)

Method and telematic equipment for determining traffic information

Title (de)

Verfahren und Telematikgerät zur Ermittlung von Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de télématique pour la détermination d'information sur la circulation

Publication

EP 0892381 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111676 A

Priority

DE 19730792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892381A2] The data is detected by sensors located in the vehicle and are communicated from the vehicle with a transmitter unit. Sensor signals occurring in vehicles ahead in the traffic are made available for warning on-coming traffic. The sensor signals are from e.g. crash sensors, sensor of a warning blinker when a car has a breakdown or brake sensor. The vehicle transmits its own and received sensor data together with position data to a central control which processes the sensor data and transmits traffic warnings to the connected vehicles. The sensors (1) are connected to inputs of an interface unit (2). A vehicle bus (3) is connected to the interface to communicate traffic relevant data. The interface is connected with a processing unit (4) which tests the sensor data for its relevance. Relevant sensor data are transferred via a transmitter/receiver unit (5) to the transmitter/receiver units (5,6) of following cars. The processing unit has a mobile radio module (7) connected to transfer its own sensor data and received sensor data via a service provider to a central control to process and provide warnings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0962

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); B60W 30/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/162 (2013.01); G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892381 A2 19990120; EP 0892381 A3 20000524; EP 0892381 B1 20040128; DE 19730792 A1 19990121; JP 3999363 B2 20071031; JP H1173595 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150625

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150625

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020906

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI