Global Patent Index - EP 0892413 B1

EP 0892413 B1 2002-11-27 - Push button

Title (en)

Push button

Title (de)

Drucktaster

Title (fr)

Bouton poussoir

Publication

EP 0892413 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111206 A

Priority

DE 19730680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730680C1] The pressbutton has a ring (1) into which a spring-loaded button (2) can be pressed to a predefined depth. The top of the button is flush with the upper edge of the ring. The ring is reduced continuously in height to at least the depth of the actuation depression on least one side parallel to the longitudinal axis of the operating finger. The ring can be reduced in height to the same extent on opposite sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/14 (2013.01); H01H 2003/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730680 C1 19980528; BR 9802485 A 19990921; EP 0892413 A2 19990120; EP 0892413 A3 19990818; EP 0892413 B1 20021127; JP H1186671 A 19990330; US 6087605 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030618

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806407 20030109

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI