Global patent index - EP 0892462 A3

EP 0892462 A3 2000-02-02 - Contact element with a connection for a stranded wire

Title (en)

Contact element with a connection for a stranded wire

Title (de)

Kontaktelement mit einem Anschluss für Litzenleiter

Title (fr)

Elément de contact avec une connection pour un conducteur torsadé

Publication

EP 0892462 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112446 A

Priority

DE 19730435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730435C1] The contact element has a terminal for a flex conductor. The contact element is esp. a high current element. The terminal end has a transverse bore (4) into which the flex conductor (5) is pushed. A threaded bore (9) is provided perpendicular to the transverse bore. The threaded bore (9) reaches the transverse bore (4). A clamp screw (10) with a ball tip (11) can be screwed into the threaded bore (9). The contact element comprises a one piece cylindrical basic body (1) of electrically conductive material. One end of this of formed as a plug end (2). The other end is formed as a conductor terminal end (3). The transverse bore (9) is provided in the conductor terminal end (3) and is formed as a stepped bore. The lead insertion side of the bore has the smallest diameter. The threaded bore runs axially in the base body (1) out from the plug end (2). The clamp screw (10) is actuated by the plug end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/36; H01R 11/05; H01R 13/11; H01R 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2006.01); H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/5091 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730435 C1 19981029; EP 0892462 A2 19990120; EP 0892462 A3 20000202; EP 0892462 B1 20040519; JP 2911889 B2 19990623; JP H1186919 A 19990330; US 6000963 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100706

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100706

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59811413

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100706

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811413

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HARTING, DIETMAR DIPL.-KFM.

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OLEJARZ, KLAUS, DIPL.-ING.

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/36 A

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/11 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 11/05 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/10 B

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 4/36 A, 7H 01R 13/11 B, 7H 01R 11/05 B, 7H 01R 15/10 B

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI