Global Patent Index - EP 0892463 A3

EP 0892463 A3 2000-02-02 - Terminal device

Title (en)

Terminal device

Title (de)

Anschlussklemmeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à bornes de connexion

Publication

EP 0892463 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112780 A

Priority

DE 19730603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892463A2] The terminal has a contact strip (4) which has three radial contact studs (21,22,3) inside a recess (18). The contact studs are separated by large interspaces (24,25,26). The ends of the contact studs go over into the contact strip. The studs have a narrower diameter than the recesses lying between (24,25,26). The construction provides a good spring effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892463 A2 19990120; EP 0892463 A3 20000202; EP 0892463 B1 20020731; AT 221701 T 20020815; DE 19730603 A1 19990211; DK 0892463 T3 20020902; ES 2176861 T3 20021201; PT 892463 E 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804971

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130709

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110710

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110709

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110709

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 221701 T

- Effective date: 20110709

2012-03-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020403073

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-01-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120109

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE)

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: VOSSLOH SCHWABE GMBH#GARTENSTRASSE 14#D-58511 LUEDENSCHEID (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#HOHE STEINERT 8#58509 LUEDENSCHEID (DE)

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176861 T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403073

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804971 20020905

2002-09-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221701 T 20020815

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI