Global Patent Index - EP 0892570 B8

EP 0892570 B8 2009-02-25 - Mobile radio communication system and radio circuit controlling method therefor

Title (en)

Mobile radio communication system and radio circuit controlling method therefor

Title (de)

Mobilfunkkommunikationssystem mit dazu passendem Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Funkschaltung

Title (fr)

Système de communication radio mobile et méthode de contrôle de circuit radio associée

Publication

EP 0892570 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 98250237 A

Priority

JP 17207097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892570A2] A mobile radio communication system which sets a radio circuit efficiently without deteriorating the communication quality even when congestion of communication channels occurs. The mobile radio communication system includes a plurality of mobile stations, a plurality of base station which can be connected to the mobile stations through radio circuits, and mobile switching center for controlling connections between the mobile stations and the base station. The mobile switching center performs connection of the mobile stations and base station for the reverse-link from the mobile stations to the base station and the forward-link from the base station to the mobile stations independently of each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 36/22 (2009.01); H04W 40/02 (2009.01); H04W 28/08 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/22 (2013.01); H04W 40/02 (2013.01); H04W 28/08 (2013.01); Y02D 70/1222 (2018.01); Y02D 70/30 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892570 A2 19990120; EP 0892570 A3 20030702; EP 0892570 B1 20081119; EP 0892570 B8 20090225; BR 9802587 A 20001205; CN 1101122 C 20030205; CN 1211153 A 19990317; DE 69840221 D1 20090102; EP 2031908 A2 20090304; EP 2031908 A3 20100414; JP 3019061 B2 20000313; JP H1175264 A 19990316; US 2001027106 A1 20011004; US 6263207 B1 20010717; US 6501954 B2 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170626

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170626

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69840221

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840221 P 20090102

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI