Global Patent Index - EP 0892700 B1

EP 0892700 B1 2000-01-26 - SCISSORS

Title (en)

SCISSORS

Title (de)

SCHERE

Title (fr)

CISEAUX

Publication

EP 0892700 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918000 A

Priority

  • DE 9700375 W
  • DE 19614691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19614691C1] A pair of scissors, in particular haircutting scissors, has a hinged joint consisting of a hinge screw (3) and a screw nut (4). The hinge screw (3) is essentially nonrotatably connected to one scissors half (2) and the screw nut (4) engages in a bore (12) in this scissors half (2). Situated in said bore (12) is a first flexible body (15) which under contact pressure sits against the end of the screw nut (4) facing the head (5) of the hinge screw (3) and against the shaft (9) of the hinge screw (3). To ensure that even a short screw nut will be securely held and can be precisely adjusted, the invention provides that the screw nut (4) has on its outer circumference a groove (18) in which is situated a second flexible body (19) which under contact pressure sits against the screw nut (4) and the bore (12) in the scissors half (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 13/28; B25B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19614691 C1 19970724; CN 1096341 C 20021218; CN 1200063 A 19981125; EP 0892700 A1 19990127; EP 0892700 B1 20000126; ES 2142670 T3 20000416; JP 2000510358 A 20000815; JP 3828937 B2 20061004; US 6408523 B1 20020625; WO 9738829 A1 19971023

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701070

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: UNITED SALON TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150212

2014-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141120 AND 20141126

2014-10-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UNITED SALON TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JAGUAR STAHLWARENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG, 42653 SOLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59701070

- Effective date: 20140910

2014-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701070

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE LIPPERT, STACHOW & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20140910

2014-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701070

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE LIPPERT, STACHOW & PARTNER, DE

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142670 T3

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701070 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT