Global Patent Index - EP 0892754 B1

EP 0892754 B1 2000-01-19 - SHEET-GUIDING SUCTION BOX

Title (en)

SHEET-GUIDING SUCTION BOX

Title (de)

SAUGKASTEN ZUM FÜHREN VON BOGEN

Title (fr)

CAISSE ASPIRANTE POUR GUIDAGE DE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 0892754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920566 A

Priority

  • DE 9700656 W
  • DE 19613084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19613084A1] The object of the invention is to adapt a sheet-guiding suction box to the sheet format. According to the invention, this object is achieved by a central suction chamber whose extension is smaller than the smallest format of a sheet to be guided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01); B65H 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01); B65H 5/222 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19613084 A1 19971009; EP 0892754 A1 19990127; EP 0892754 B1 20000119; ES 2142678 T3 20000416; JP H11509506 A 19990824; US 6176482 B1 20010123; WO 9736813 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142678

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990517

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981012

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI