Global Patent Index - EP 0892864 B1

EP 0892864 B1 2000-07-26 - AXIAL DISC BRAKE AND THREAD FEED FITTED THEREWITH

Title (en)

AXIAL DISC BRAKE AND THREAD FEED FITTED THEREWITH

Title (de)

AXIALE SCHEIBENBREMSE UND FADENLIEFERGERÄT MIT AXIALER SCHEIBENBREMSE

Title (fr)

FREIN A DISQUE AXIAL ET APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION EN FIL EQUIPE D'UN TEL FREIN

Publication

EP 0892864 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914308 A

Priority

  • DE 19613055 A
  • EP 9701523 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19613055A1] In an axial disc brake (B), especially for a thread feed, having dynamically balanced and dimensionally stable braking surfaces (1, 2) pressed against each other yieldingly by under a predetermined pressure, one of which has a central withdrawal aperture and is arranged on a brake component which is supported to move at least axially, one braking surface (1) is spherically convex and the other (2) is tapered with a taper axis fitting at least approximately in the axis (3) of the disc brake (B) and the taper generator in the contact region (C) of the braking surfaces (1, 2) is a tangent (T) of the generating circle of the spherically convex braking surface (1). The axial disc brake (B) is preferably fitted on the front of a storage drum (D) of a thread feed (F) for a gripper or shuttle loom in such a way that the thread unwinding over head clockwise from the storage drum (D) and rotating along a thread guide (6) is taken directly without deflection into the contact region of the braking surface and is only gently deflected axially again after passing the contact region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19613055 A1 19971002; CN 1063242 C 20010314; CN 1215442 A 19990428; EP 0892864 A1 19990127; EP 0892864 B1 20000726; KR 20000004939 A 20000125; US 6257516 B1 20010710; WO 9737069 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110325

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702079 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL SE

2000-07-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980824

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL SE