Global Patent Index - EP 0892881 B1

EP 0892881 B1 2003-06-25 - DOOR BRACE

Title (en)

DOOR BRACE

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSSTANGE

Title (fr)

JAMBE DE FORCE POUR PORTE

Publication

EP 0892881 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97915230 A

Priority

  • CA 9700239 W
  • US 62948396 A
  • US 76352296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738197A1] A door brace (5) for bracing a door against a fixed object and for controlling the opening and closing of the door includes an elongate member (10, 15) of variable length, extendable and rectractable between a first length and a second length; a first anchor means (110) constructed and arranged to secure a first end of the elongate member to a door; a second anchor means (70) constructed and arranged to secure a second end of the elongate member to a fixed object; and control means for forcefully extending the elongate member from the first and toward the second length. The door is at least partially open when the elongate member is at the first length, and closed when the elongate member is at the second length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738197 A1 19971016; AU 2284097 A 19971029; CA 2251083 A1 19971016; CA 2251083 C 20010814; DE 69723064 D1 20030731; DE 69723064 T2 20040506; EP 0892881 A1 19990127; EP 0892881 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040412

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723064 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010427

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981111

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL