Global Patent Index - EP 0892944 B1

EP 0892944 B1 2000-01-12 - WATCH

Title (en)

WATCH

Title (de)

UHR

Title (fr)

MONTRE

Publication

EP 0892944 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97914510 A

Priority

  • CH 93196 A
  • IB 9700380 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739386A1] This invention features a watch which consists of a rotating bezel (8) with a ring-shaped part (8a) projecting from its lower surface and with a serrated edge at the end (8b). This ring-shaped part (8a) is fitted into an indentation (7) in the rim (3) and its toothed part meshes with a pinion (16) with an axial aperture of square cross-section fitting onto a segment (15a) of complementary cross-section on the winding stem (15). The pinion (16) is located in a case (14) open laterally on the external surface of the rim (3) and maintained in this case (14) by a shutting device (17). The winding stem (15) can be axially moved between at least two positions while remaining constantly meshed with the rotating bezel (8) by means of the pinion (16) allowing the rewinding or setting of the watch by rotating the bezel (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 27/08; G04B 1/18; G04B 3/08; G04B 19/28; G04B 37/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/08 (2006.01); G04B 19/28 (2006.01); G04B 27/08 (2006.01); G04B 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 27/08 (2013.01); G04B 3/08 (2013.01); G04B 19/283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9739386 A1 19971023; AU 2174297 A 19971107; CN 1138190 C 20040211; CN 1215483 A 19990428; DE 69701136 D1 20000217; DE 69701136 T2 20000921; EP 0892944 A1 19990127; EP 0892944 B1 20000112; HK 1021416 A1 20000915; JP 2000508764 A 20000711; TW 340200 B 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150410

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701136

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150407

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS SAVOYE & CRONIN

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701136 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990527

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981008

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI