Global Patent Index - EP 0893079 A3

EP 0893079 A3 2001-12-05 - Technical column

Title (en)

Technical column

Title (de)

Techniksäule

Title (fr)

Colonne technique

Publication

EP 0893079 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110983 A

Priority

DE 19731440 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893079A2] The column (1) from which an equipment-holder (2)is suspended, is rotarily positioned on a base plate rotarily fixed to the ground. The C-shaped equipment-holder has rapid fastenings for fixing it at different heights to the columns. The column consists of a basic body with two-part metal planking enclosing at least one hollow interior. The top end side of the column has a light; the rear of the column has a screen (3) made of light-permeable, sound-proof material. The column is joined to a flexible partition(4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893079 A2 19990127; EP 0893079 A3 20011205; DE 19731440 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI