Global Patent Index - EP 0893129 A3

EP 0893129 A3 2000-10-04 - Polymeric material for medical instruments

Title (en)

Polymeric material for medical instruments

Title (de)

Polymermaterial zur Herstellung medizinischer Arbeitsmittel

Title (fr)

Matériau polimérique pour la production d'instruments médicaux

Publication

EP 0893129 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111152 A

Priority

DE 19727446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893129A2] A polymer material (P) is used for making medical implements is non-polar and hydrophobic, and has the following properties: (a) molecular weight less than 50000 g/mole, (b) melt viscosity less than 1000 Poise at 10000 l/s shear, (c) crystallinity less than 19%, (d) additive content less than 5000 ppm and (e) impurity content less than 1000 ppm. Also claimed are (i) tubes (T1) made from (P), used for storing or transporting blood (or components thereof) or medical solutions, (ii) multi-layer tubes (T2) including at least one layer comprising (T1), (iii) the preparation of (T1), where (P) has a smooth and practically crystallite-free surface after moulding, and (iv) the preparation of (T2) by coextrusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 29/00; A61L 27/00; A61L 31/00; A61L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 29/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61M 39/00 (2006.01); C08L 9/06 (2006.01); C08L 23/04 (2006.01); C08L 53/00 (2006.01); C08L 53/02 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 53/025 (2013.01); C08L 23/04 (2013.01); C08L 53/00 (2013.01); C08L 53/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 23/04 + C08L 2666/04

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727446 A1 19990107; EP 0893129 A2 19990127; EP 0893129 A3 20001004; JP H1170162 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110104

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61L 29/00 A, 7A 61L 27/00 B, 7A 61L 31/00 B, 7A 61L 33/00 B

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI