Global Patent Index - EP 0893141 B1

EP 0893141 B1 2003-06-04 - Overpressure ventilation device for gas mask

Title (en)

Overpressure ventilation device for gas mask

Title (de)

Überdrucklüftungsvorrichtung für Gasmaske

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation en surpression pour masque à gaz

Publication

EP 0893141 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401841 A

Priority

FR 9709278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893141A1] The ventilator assembly, comprising a centrifugal fan (8) before the filter (4,5), incorporates a support (14) which is fixed to the filter cover (3) and enables the fan rotor (10) and its drive motor (11) to be centred on the filter's lengthwise axis to assure an axial flow from the fan. The filter cover (3) has a recess (13) to receive the support, made with a lateral wall (15) to co-operate with a coupling surface (22) on the support. A second lateral wall (16) extends from the first, and a base (17) has apertures (18) for the air to flow through. The support is in the form of a centering cap for the fan rotor and drive motor, and has a deflector (23) between it and the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893141 A1 19990127; EP 0893141 B1 20030604; CA 2242667 A1 19990122; CA 2242667 C 20060704; DE 69815217 D1 20030710; DE 69815217 T2 20040429; FR 2766377 A1 19990129; FR 2766377 B1 19990917; US 6050262 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-02-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070721

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070721

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070721

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815217 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI GB NL

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990621

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB NL

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI