Global Patent Index - EP 0893144 B1

EP 0893144 B1 2003-06-04 - Heel holder for a ski binding

Title (en)

Heel holder for a ski binding

Title (de)

Fersenteil einer Skibindung

Title (fr)

Talonnière de fixation de ski

Publication

EP 0893144 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810667 A

Priority

FR 9709534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893144A1] The heelpiece comprises a sole clip (7) mounted on a stirrup (4,5) which is articulated on a plate (3). The plate pivots on a baseplate (2) which is fixed to a slider (1) that is attached to the ski. There is a ski brake (8) at the front of the pivoting plate which is mounted on the baseplate. The brake is articulated around an axis b that is transverse to the baseplate and raised by the pressure of the ski boot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 7/10; A63C 9/082; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/084 (2012.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0844 (2013.01); A63C 7/1013 (2013.01); A63C 9/0845 (2013.01); A63C 9/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893144 A1 19990127; EP 0893144 B1 20030604; AT 242026 T 20030615; DE 69815218 D1 20030710; DE 69815218 T2 20040429; FR 2766380 A1 19990129; FR 2766380 B1 19991008; US 6244617 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815218

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080713

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2004-07-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815218 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI