Global Patent Index - EP 0893151 B1

EP 0893151 B1 2002-11-27 - Dust filter bag

Title (en)

Dust filter bag

Title (de)

Staubfilterbeutel

Title (fr)

Sac filtrant à poussières

Publication

EP 0893151 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107934 A

Priority

DE 19731860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893151A2] The dust filter bag has a fibre layer (4, 5) laminated to a paper layer (2) at the clean gas side. The fibres are of a synthetic polymer. The fibres have an electrostatic charge in a fibre layer (4, 5) with residual strength through adhesive bonding and/or inter-looping of the fibres against each other to bond their fibres and/or filaments together. The fibre layer (4, 5) has fused polymer window zones for additional material strength and bonding with the paper layer (2). The fused polymer zones can be in bars or distributed to form a honeycomb or waffle structure to give dust chambers. The fused polymer zones penetrate at least partially into the paper layer (2), which increases the paper resistance to moisture and/or increases its shear strength. The fibre layer has at least two layers (4, 5), with a spun bond nonwoven layer (4) on the side away from the paper (2) and with microfibres in the melt-blown layer (5) against the paper (2). The layer (5) of microfibres has a weight of 5-40 g/m<2>, and the two fibre layers (4, 5) together have a weight of 5-50 g/m<2>. The material for the paper layer (2) has a weight of 20-100 g/m<2>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 46/02; A47L 9/14; B01D 39/16; B01D 39/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/12 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); B01D 39/18 (2006.01); B01D 46/02 (2006.01); B32B 29/02 (2006.01); D04H 1/60 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 5/26 (2013.01); A47L 9/14 (2013.01); B01D 39/1623 (2013.01); B01D 39/18 (2013.01); B01D 46/02 (2013.01); B32B 5/022 (2013.01); B32B 7/12 (2013.01); B32B 29/02 (2013.01); D04H 1/4374 (2013.01); D04H 1/559 (2013.01); D04H 1/60 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01); B32B 2307/718 (2013.01); Y10S 15/08 (2013.01); Y10S 55/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893151 A2 19990127; EP 0893151 A3 19990901; EP 0893151 B1 20021127; AR 009890 A1 20000503; BR 9802591 A 20001205; CN 1073874 C 20011031; CN 1208666 A 19990224; DE 19731860 C1 19990128; ES 2186042 T3 20030501; JP 3020479 B2 20000315; JP H1199107 A 19990413; US 6045595 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186042 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2000-06-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990925

1999-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 01D 46/02 A, 6B 01D 39/18 B, 6A 47L 9/14 B, 6B 01D 39/16 B

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI