Global Patent Index - EP 0893172 B1

EP 0893172 B1 2000-11-29 - Method of producing a piece having the form of a hollow profile

Title (en)

Method of producing a piece having the form of a hollow profile

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines hohlprofilförmigen Bauteils

Title (fr)

Méthode de production d' une pièce ayant la forme d' un profilé creux

Publication

EP 0893172 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112423 A

Priority

DE 19730481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730481C1] A hollow profile of light metal or other materials with low breaking stretch is expanded by internal high pressure forming. A sleeve (5) of a material with higher ductility than light metal, e.g. steel, is positioned on the hollow profile (4). During expansion of a profile section (13) using high forming levels exceeding the ductility of light metal, that section is covered. The profile within this section is expanded by internal high pressure to beyond burst limit, the sleeve above the burst part of the finished profile is directly pressure-charged and expanded on its own, until the final shape of the component within the area covered by the sleeve is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/051 (2011.01); B21D 26/053 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/053 (2013.01); B21D 26/051 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49622 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49805 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4994 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730481 C1 19980709; EP 0893172 A1 19990127; EP 0893172 B1 20001129; ES 2153698 T3 20010301; US 6065211 A 20000523; US 6299242 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020810

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-03-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153698 T3

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000221

1999-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI