Global Patent Index - EP 0893178 A3

EP 0893178 A3 2000-08-16 - Punching and stamping tool

Title (en)

Punching and stamping tool

Title (de)

Stanz-Prägewerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil pour poinçonnage et estampage

Publication

EP 0893178 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112948 A

Priority

  • DE 29713346 U
  • DE 29716441 U
  • DE 19808016 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6041493A] A rivet tool has a rivet pin which can be moved in a bore of a stamp die. The tool consists of a hydraulic cylinder having two pistons in which the first piston carries the rivet pin and the second piston carries the stamp die. The chamber between the pistons is connected with a variable volume pressure chamber. The cylinder chamber, which is facing the first piston, is connected with a pressure cylinder. After a rivet has been conveyed to beneath the rivet pin, a pressure cylinder is activated and a throttle interconnected between the chamber between the pistons and the pressure chamber. The stamping process is carried out hereby and the first piston is then pressed in direction of the second piston, whereby the first piston then lies on top of the second piston to effect the stamping process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/02 (2006.01); B21J 15/20 (2006.01); B21J 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/36 (2013.01); B21J 15/025 (2013.01); B21J 15/20 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53065 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5377 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6041493 A 20000328; CA 2243922 A1 19990126; CA 2243922 C 20060926; EP 0893178 A2 19990127; EP 0893178 A3 20000816; EP 0893178 B1 20030409; ES 2193444 T3 20031101

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193444 T3

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000812

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 15/02 A, 7B 21J 15/20 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI