Global Patent Index - EP 0893202 A3

EP 0893202 A3 2000-08-30 - Device for obtaining safety stamps applicable to paper or other laminar elements

Title (en)

Device for obtaining safety stamps applicable to paper or other laminar elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Sicherheitsstempeln für Papier oder andere laminierte Elemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'obtention de marques de sécurité applicables au papier ou autres éléments laminés

Publication

EP 0893202 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500139 A

Priority

AR 9703151 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893202A2] Device for obtaining safety stamps applicable to paper or other laminar elements. Said device comprises a supporting cylinder (a) for paper (3) fitted with reliefs (5) separated from an abrasive periphery (2') wheel (b) along a distance that is shorter than the height of said relief (5) peaks (5'); the device includes antisliding pressure means (c) and adjustment means (d) for applying the paper (3) to the cylinder (a) side walls (1'), in addition to angular drive means (15) in said supporting cylinder (a). In view that the distance separating the abrasive wheel (b) from the supporting cylinder (a) is shorter than the height of the relief (5) peaks (5') when the relief (5) enters the contact zone, the abrasive periphery (2') of the wheel (b) abrades the ends of said peaks (5'), resulting in a water mark being implemented. The antisliding pressure means (c) secure the paper (3) in place, while the adjustment means (d) preclude any paper (3) maladjustment in the critical abrasion zone. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/22; B41M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/22 (2006.01); B41M 3/10 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B44B 5/00 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/223 (2013.01); B41M 3/10 (2013.01); B41M 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893202 A2 19990127; EP 0893202 A3 20000830; EP 0893202 B1 20040407; ES 2219858 T3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050611

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050610

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219858 T3

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-07-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822932 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24B 19/22 A, 7B 41M 3/14 B, 7B 65H 5/22 B, 7B 44B 5/00 B, 7B 44C 1/22 B

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI