Global Patent Index - EP 0893255 B1

EP 0893255 B1 2001-05-30 - Method and device for positioning an actuator of a printing machine

Title (en)

Method and device for positioning an actuator of a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Positionieren eines Stellgliedes einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le positionnement d'un éléments de réglage d'une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0893255 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112835 A

Priority

DE 19732249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893255A1] The actuator is moved by a drive mechanism towards a stop piece especially in the form of a rotary roller. The position of the actuator is detected by a position-indicator. The actuator's drive mechanisms is connected to a motor control and positioned by command(M). At least one auxiliary characteristic line (HK) differing in course from the characteristic line (K) defined by the commands and the position-indicator signals (S) is determined by the motor control during the movement of the actuator towards the stop piece. The command-value used for subsequent positioning procedures is obtainable as a zero position of the actuator fro the values and or course of the at least one auxiliary characteristic line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/04; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/045 (2013.01); B41F 33/0054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893255 A1 19990127; EP 0893255 B1 20010530; DE 19732249 A1 19990128; JP H1191080 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800780

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030710

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-07-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800780 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI