Global patent index - EP 0893265 A3

EP 0893265 A3 2000-05-10 - Ink-jet printing apparatus

Title (en)

Ink-jet printing apparatus

Title (de)

Farbstrahldruckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0893265 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98111607 A

Priority

JP 21599197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893265A2] A recording head (1) is so designed that a plurality of nozzle openings (2) for each of the nozzle opening arrays (K, C, M, Y) are arranged at intervals of at least four or more print-pitches in the sub-scanning direction, that the nozzle opening arrays are divided into at least two groups, that the nozzle opening arrays belonging to each of the groups are positioned along the same line in the main scanning direction, and that the groups are shifted away from each other at least two print-pitches in the sub-scanning direction. Dots of different groups do not contact each other during printing, and when printing for one scan line is completed, a recording medium is fed a number of print-pitches that corresponds to the nozzle opening count, so that a paper feeding distance error can be constant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/15 (2006.01); B41J 2/205 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/2056 (2013.01); B41J 2/15 (2013.01); B41J 2/2103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893265 A2 19990127; EP 0893265 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI