Global Patent Index - EP 0893380 B1

EP 0893380 B1 2002-09-25 - Printer for office machines with improved image centring

Title (en)

Printer for office machines with improved image centring

Title (de)

Drucker für Büromaschinen mit verbesserter Bildzentrierung

Title (fr)

Imprimante pour machine de bureau à cadrage d'image amélioré

Publication

EP 0893380 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401633 A

Priority

FR 9709350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893380A1] Sensors (37,38,12) for detection of the difference in position of a sheet of paper (10) with respect to a predetermined position are configured to realign the sheet (10) relative to the electronic image, which is to be printed, using the various rollers (31-36) and positioning devices to achieve this. A central control unit and re-alignment circuit are used to control the roller driver motors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10; B65H 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/08 (2006.01); B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/002 (2013.01); B65H 7/08 (2013.01); B65H 2511/24 (2013.01); B65H 2511/413 (2013.01); B65H 2513/11 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/24 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2511/413 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2513/11 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893380 A1 19990127; EP 0893380 B1 20020925; DE 69808193 D1 20021031; DE 69808193 T2 20030605; FR 2766414 A1 19990129; FR 2766414 B1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808193

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS S. A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69808193

- Effective date: 20130129

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69808193

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69808193

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69808193

- Representative's name: ,

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SAGEM

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808193 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CAVARERO, ERIC

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOISHARDY, PASCAL

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEROY, JACQUES

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000621

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990707

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI