Global patent index - EP 0893389 A3

EP 0893389 A3 2000-12-20 - Hanging coupling for lifting devices, in particular for picking-up or depositing thermally insulated covers

Title (en)

Hanging coupling for lifting devices, in particular for picking-up or depositing thermally insulated covers

Title (de)

Hängekupplung für Hubvorrichtungen, insbesondere für das Aufnehmen und Absetzen von Wärme-Isolierhauben

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accrochage pour appareils de levage, en particulier pour prendre ou déposer des capots d'isolation thermique

Publication

EP 0893389 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112859 A

Priority

DE 29712552 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893389A2] On one end of a traverse (1) is double-armed lever pair (2) turnably linked mirror-wise to one another. One of the lever arm pair (2a) is connected with a lift system (5) on the upper part of the traverse via linking rods (4). The other lever arm pair (2b) is on the lower part of the traverse and has hook-shaped ends. On the upper side of a heat insulating hood (6), carrier lugs (6a) are coupleablly arranged, whilst an electric pulling magnet (7), with its associated anchor (8), is on the traverse and the upper lever arm pair that lie opposite one another. Detachable inter-locking alignment elements (9,10) can be arranged on the surface between the traverse and the heat insulating hood.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21C 47/24 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01); B66C 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712552 U1 19971002; EP 0893389 A2 19990127; EP 0893389 A3 20001220; JP H1177155 A 19990323; US 6039374 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-04-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: THERMALLY INSULATED COVER AND LIFTING DEVICE THEREFOR

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040528

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT SE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980711

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI