Global Patent Index - EP 0893543 B1

EP 0893543 B1 2002-11-13 - A recessed cistern for a dual control flushing system

Title (en)

A recessed cistern for a dual control flushing system

Title (de)

Unterputzspülkasten für eine Doppelkontrolle eines Spülsystems

Title (fr)

Citerne encastrée pour un contrôle double d'un système de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 0893543 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98113805 A

Priority

IT TO970162 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893543A1] A recessed cistern for a flushing system for sanitary use, including a cistern body or tank (2) for containing the water, a support frame (5) mounted in the upper part of the tank (2) and which supports a control device (1) for opening the water outlet valve; the control device (1) is, in turn, manually operated by an external actuator element, for example, a rocking switch connected to a rod (22) hinged to an angle lever (9) of the control device (1); according to the invention, depending on the installation requirements, the cistern has two openings through which the aforesaid control device (1) passes, one horizontal and the other vertical, possibly closed by reduced portions, and the outlet valve can be operated through both of the said apertures, as the angle lever (2) includes two pairs (10) and (11) of substantially perpendicular arms in which the arms of each pair have hinge seats (24, 25) in which the rod (22) can be selectively engaged, depending on the type of operation of the cistern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012; E03D 5/092

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01); E03D 5/092 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2013.01); E03D 5/092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893543 A1 19990127; EP 0893543 B1 20021113; AT 227794 T 20021115; DE 69809343 D1 20021219; DE 69809343 T2 20031009; DK 0893543 T3 20030310; ES 2187862 T3 20030616; IT 236293 Y1 20000808; IT TO970162 U1 19990125; PT 893543 E 20030331

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110723

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809343

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227794 T

- Effective date: 20110723

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VALSIR S.P.A.

- Free text: VALSIR S.P.A.#LOCALITA MERLARO, 2#25078 VESTONE (BS) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- VALSIR S.P.A.#LOCALITA MERLARO, 2#25078 VESTONE (BS) (IT)

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2010-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-02-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100125

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA;25, AVENUE DU PAILLY;1220 LES AVANCHETS (CH)

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070802

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187862 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809343 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980730

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227794 T 20021115

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

1999-10-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980730

1999-02-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAROTTI, MARIO

1999-02-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAROTTI, MARIO

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980730