Global Patent Index - EP 0893551 A3

EP 0893551 A3 2000-06-07 - A method for preparing and for removing a strand with a weakened breaking portion

Title (en)

A method for preparing and for removing a strand with a weakened breaking portion

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen und zum Entfernen einer Litze mit Soll-Bruchstelle

Title (fr)

Procédé pour préparer et pour retirer un toron avec une portion affaiblie de rupture

Publication

EP 0893551 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113443 A

Priority

DE 19732023 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893551A2] Cables such as steel tensioning cables used for bridges etc. are removed from the positions in which they are laid by mechanical weakening. Preferably at least one of the wires (9) of the cable is mechanically weakened or cut through. Particularly the core wire of the cable is cut through. The method may be carried out using an opener (8) to open the cable, a shearing tool (10) to cut through or score a wire and a closer (11) to close the cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16; E04C 5/00; E04C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/16 (2006.01); E02D 5/80 (2006.01); E04C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2013.01); E01D 19/16 (2013.01); E04C 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893551 A2 19990127; EP 0893551 A3 20000607; DE 19732023 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/16 A, 7E 04C 5/08 B, 7E 04C 5/00 B, 7E 02D 5/76 B, 7D 07B 7/18 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI