Global Patent Index - EP 0893582 A3

EP 0893582 A3 2000-01-05 - Method for controlling a coolant pump of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for controlling a coolant pump of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Kühlmittelpumpe einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d' une pompe de refroidissement d' un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0893582 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890207 A

Priority

AT 125197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893582A2] The method involves controlling a coolant pump of a combustion engine, whereby a heat quantity to be conducted is determined from at least one motor operating parameter, and a pulse width modulation of a control signal for a nominal number of revolutions of the coolant pump is produced in dependence on the heat quantity. The signal is examined for errors through comparisons with a predefined nominal signal range. If an error of the signal is determined, an emergency program for the coolant pump is performed, otherwise the number of revolutions of the coolant pump is regulated in response to the produced signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/14; F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/14 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/14 (2013.01); F01P 7/164 (2013.01); F04D 15/0066 (2013.01); F04D 15/0077 (2013.01); F01P 2031/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893582 A2 19990127; EP 0893582 A3 20000105; EP 0893582 B1 20021030; AT 227001 T 20021115; AT 502321 A1 20070215; AT 502321 A8 20070815; AT 502321 B1 20070615; AT 502321 B8 20070815; DE 59806097 D1 20021205; ES 2183316 T3 20030316; US 6216645 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59806097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-10-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59806097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-10-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2009-07-30 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-07-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TCG UNITECH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-12-13 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20060808

2003-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PIERBURG GMBH

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2183316

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 227001

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR IT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01P 5/14 A, 7F 01P 7/16 B, 7F 04D 15/00 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TCG UNITECH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI