Global patent index - EP 0893601 A3

EP 0893601 A3 2000-03-01 - Combination of a piston pump with a booster pump

Title (en)

Combination of a piston pump with a booster pump

Title (de)

Pumpenanordnung mit einer Kolbenpumpe und einer Boosterpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à piston combinée avec une pompe de surpression

Publication

EP 0893601 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111868 A

Priority

DE 19732062 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893601A2] The piston pump is operable in both rotary directions of the drive shaft (24) and the booster pump is accordingly suitably formed. The booster pump housing contains a changeover section (15) in which a pump wheel (11) is arranged on a shaft (12) and is closed with a cover (8) fitted removably on the housing. An axially delivering booster pump enables the removed cover (8) to release the pump wheel which is then exchangeable against a pump wheel for the opposite direction of rotation. With a radially delivering booster pump the pump wheel (11) has radially running blades (13). The changeover section (15) is so formed that a ring space is formed between the outer periphery of the pump wheel (11) and the inside of the changeover section. The ring space radial width is constant along the total periphery of the pump wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 23/10; F04B 23/14; F04D 29/48; F04D 29/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/10 (2006.01); F04B 23/14 (2006.01); F04D 13/12 (2006.01); F04D 29/48 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/12 (2013.01); F04B 23/10 (2013.01); F04B 23/14 (2013.01); F04D 29/486 (2013.01); F04D 29/628 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893601 A2 19990127; EP 0893601 A3 20000301; EP 0893601 B1 20040512; DE 19732062 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811361

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030318

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 23/10 A, 7F 04D 29/62 B, 7F 04D 29/48 B, 7F 04B 23/14 B

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI