Global Patent Index - EP 0893777 A3

EP 0893777 A3 2000-09-20 - A data card housing

Title (en)

A data card housing

Title (de)

Datenkartengehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour carte de données

Publication

EP 0893777 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305891 A

Priority

GB 9715811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893777A2] A data card housing (32) is provided which has a reading region (34) and a loading region (33). A data card is to be located at a reading position, and the reading region (34) has grooves (36) for guiding the card to the reading position. The loading region (33) has a supporting surface (31), and is arranged such that force can be applied to a major face of the card, to slide the card along the supporting surface (31) and into the guide grooves (36). Further, the reading region (34) is arranged such that force can be applied to the major face of the card to further slide the card to the reading position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04Q 7/32 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/0021 (2013.01); G06K 13/06 (2013.01); H04B 1/3816 (2013.01); H04M 2250/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893777 A2 19990127; EP 0893777 A3 20000920; EP 0893777 B1 20070228; CA 2243683 A1 19990125; DE 69837176 D1 20070412; DE 69837176 T2 20071115; ES 2281121 T3 20070916; GB 2327792 A 19990203; GB 2327792 B 20010912; GB 9715811 D0 19971001; JP 3682757 B2 20050810; JP H11155004 A 19990608; US 6226189 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-28 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY; FI

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-11-30 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY

- Effective date: 20151124

2015-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY, FI

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOKIA CORP., 02610 ESPOO, FI

- Document: DE 69837176

2015-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69837176

- Representative's name: BECKER, KURIG, STRAUS, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2281121 T3

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837176 P 20070412

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040716

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI