Global Patent Index - EP 0893806 A3

EP 0893806 A3 2000-04-12 - Current transformer device with a current shunting path and its use

Title (en)

Current transformer device with a current shunting path and its use

Title (de)

Stromwandleranordnung mit einer Nebenstrombahn sowie deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Transformateur de courant à circuit auxiliaire et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0893806 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250262 A

Priority

DE 19731813 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893806A2] The arrangement (1) includes a primary conductor passing through a current converter (7), which is formed as element of a branch current path (6) of a main current conductor (2). The main current conductor has a rectangular cross-section with opposite narrow sides (4) and broadsides (5), and is formed through a connection rail of a low-voltage power switch. The branch current path comprises a centrepiece (10) extending crosswise to the flow direction (11) of the current in the main conductor, as primary conductor of the current converter. Connecting thighs (12, 13) are provided, outgoing from the centrepiece, and a supporting foot part (14; 15) is provided for each connecting thigh. The foot parts of both connecting thighs are fastened mechanically and electrically conducting on support surfaces (17) on the main current conductor, which are arranged in a distance to each other on one of the broadsides, in the flow direction of the current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/30; G01R 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893806 A2 19990127; EP 0893806 A3 20000412; DE 19731813 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 38/30 A, 7G 01R 15/18 B

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI