Global Patent Index - EP 0893846 B1

EP 0893846 B1 2002-09-11 - Electrical apparatus having a fixed contact carrier and a connecting terminal

Title (en)

Electrical apparatus having a fixed contact carrier and a connecting terminal

Title (de)

Elektrischer Apparat mit einem festen Kontaktträger und einer Anschlussklemme

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique portant un support de contact fixe et une borne de raccordement

Publication

EP 0893846 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401725 A

Priority

FR 9709205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893846A1] The mechanism has a square holder section (3) with an electrical connector plate (4) from the apparatus directly attached. There is an internally held cable holder (6) and upper tightening screw (1) together with a side plate which is attached to the screw and clamps into place on the cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30; H01R 4/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/30 (2006.01); H01R 4/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/305 (2013.01); H01R 4/363 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893846 A1 19990127; EP 0893846 B1 20020911; DE 69807799 D1 20021017; DE 69807799 T2 20030528; ES 2181139 T3 20030216; FR 2766297 A1 19990122; FR 2766297 B1 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100709

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807799

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181139 T3

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807799 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI