Global Patent Index - EP 0893851 B1

EP 0893851 B1 2001-12-12 - Electric contact with elastic return

Title (en)

Electric contact with elastic return

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kontakt mit elastischer Rückführung

Title (fr)

Contact électrique à rappel élastique

Publication

EP 0893851 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401593 A

Priority

FR 9709274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0893851A1] The flexible grip electrical contact has a cable holder with an end cavity. The cable has an outer contact attachment (2) added, which fits into the cavity. The attachment is held in place in the cavity by a side shaped plate grip (3) which is spring (11) operated. The end of the cable entering the holder is held in place by a hook fastener (1'').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/24; H01R 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 13/15 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/2421 (2013.01); H01R 13/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0893851 A1 19990127; EP 0893851 B1 20011212; AU 741150 B2 20011122; AU 7620398 A 19990204; CA 2242674 A1 19990122; DE 69802874 D1 20020124; DE 69802874 T2 20020613; ES 2166591 T3 20020416; FR 2766629 A1 19990129; FR 2766629 B1 19990903; JP H11144777 A 19990528; US 6120305 A 20000919; ZA 9806426 B 19990122

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050626

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030627

2004-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040624

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030627

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020522

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166591 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802874 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI