Global Patent Index - EP 0893958 B1

EP 0893958 B1 2000-03-29 - BRUSH FOR GUM MASSAGE AND TOOTH CLEANING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE BRISTLES OF SUCH A BRUSH

Title (en)

BRUSH FOR GUM MASSAGE AND TOOTH CLEANING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE BRISTLES OF SUCH A BRUSH

Title (de)

BÜRSTE ZUR ZAHNFLEISCHMASSAGE UND ZAHNREINIGUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER BORSTEN EINER SOLCHEN BÜRSTE

Title (fr)

BROSSE POUR MASSER LA GENCIVE ET BROSSER LES DENTS ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES SOIES CONVENANT A UNE BROSSE DE CE TYPE

Publication

EP 0893958 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920666 A

Priority

  • DE 19615098 A
  • EP 9701839 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19615098A1] A brush for gum massage and tooth cleaning consists of a head with a handle an plastic bristles in the head individually or in bunches. To improve the massaging action the bristles are formed with stamped bulges and corrugated with a short corrugation length transversely to their axes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/00; D02G 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A46D 1/04 (2006.01); A46D 1/08 (2006.01); D02G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/0238 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/08 (2013.01); D02G 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615098 A1 19971023; AR 006660 A1 19990908; AT 191130 T 20000415; AU 2696397 A 19971107; AU 712827 B2 19991118; BR 9708690 A 19990803; CA 2251753 A1 19971023; CN 1216451 A 19990512; CZ 9803310 A3 19990217; EP 0893958 A1 19990203; EP 0893958 B1 20000329; ES 2144858 T3 20000616; ID 16825 A 19971113; IN 190449 B 20030726; JP 2001500395 A 20010116; KR 20000005522 A 20000125; NO 984822 A 19981210; NO 984822 D0 19981015; PL 329289 A1 19990315; TR 9802092 T2 19990118; TW 344657 B 19981111; US 6141818 A 20001107; WO 9738603 A1 19971023; ZA 9703234 B 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050413

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CORONET-WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144858 T3

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701363 20000504

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191130 T 20000415

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE