Global Patent Index - EP 0893961 B1

EP 0893961 B1 2000-03-22 - DISPENSER FOR SOAP POWDER

Title (en)

DISPENSER FOR SOAP POWDER

Title (de)

DOSIERSPENDER FÜR SEIFENPULVER

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR-DOSEUR DE SAVON EN POUDRE

Publication

EP 0893961 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918148 A

Priority

  • DE 29607187 U
  • DE 29607668 U
  • EP 9701960 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739672A2] The invention relates to a dispenser for soap powder for metered spraying of soap powder or the like onto a hand. Said dispenser comprises a dispenser part (1), a container (2) and a support (3), said dispenser part (1) being incorporated in the container (2) or being separate. The dispenser part (1) has a metering slide (4) having metering openings (6) with dimensions in length and width or diameter which enable filling of the metering openings (6) when the metering slide (4) is moved, and with a depth which is calculated as a function of the amount of soap powder to be metered. When the metering slide (4) is in the normal position, the metering openings (6) are open at the top and closed at the bottom. When the metering slide (4) is actuated, they are initially closed at the top and the bottom and in the dispensing position are open at the bottom. The metering slide (4) is oblique or has upper surfaces which fall obliquely, and has an actuation surface (10) or (13) at one end. The top surface of said metering slide (4) has projections (14) in the region of the container (2) opening. Said metering slide (4) also has an integrally moulded non-return spring (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/10; A47F 1/035; G01F 11/18; G01F 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9739672 A2 19971030; WO 9739672 A3 19980205; EP 0893961 A2 19990203; EP 0893961 B1 20000322; EP 0943279 A2 19990922; EP 0943279 A3 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701315 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981010

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE