Global patent index - EP 0893964 B1

EP 0893964 B1 2000-05-17 - VACUUM CLEANER WITH A CHAMBER FOR HOLDING THE DUST BAG

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER WITH A CHAMBER FOR HOLDING THE DUST BAG

Title (de)

STAUBSAUGER MIT EINER KAMMER ZUR AUFNAHME EINES STAUBFILTERBEUTELS

Title (fr)

ASPIRATEUR POURVU D'UN LOGEMENT POUR SAC-FILTRE A POUSSIERE

Publication

EP 0893964 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97908167 A

Priority

  • DE 19613511 A
  • EP 9701072 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19613511A1] The invention relates to a vacuum cleaner with a chamber (7) for holding a dust bag (20), said chamber (7) being closed by a swinging cover (T). An actuation projection (B) is arranged on the lower side of the swinging cover (T), is pivotably connected to the swinging cover (T) and also has a register projection (81) thereon (B) which moves into a register opening (83) of the chamber (7) after pivoting of the actuation projection (B). To produce a vacuum cleaner of said type which can be handled and operated more easily, in particular with respect to a facility allowing to know whether a dust bay is inserted, it is proposed that the register projection (81) is constructed at that end of the actuation projection (B) which is connected to the swinging cover (T), and extends substantially at right angles to a plane extension of the actuation projection (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1445 (2013.01); A47L 9/00 (2013.01); A47L 9/1427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719890 U1 19980219; AT 192911 T 20000615; DE 19613511 A1 19971009; EP 0893964 A1 19990203; EP 0893964 B1 20000517; ES 2146085 T3 20000716; WO 9737578 A1 19971016

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080305

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-03-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070306

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-03-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146085

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701719

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192911

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981002

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE