Global Patent Index - EP 0894003 A4

EP 0894003 A4 2000-10-04 - N-FORMYL HYDROXYLAMINE CONTAINING COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS ACE INHIBITORS AND/OR NEP INHIBITORS

Title (en)

N-FORMYL HYDROXYLAMINE CONTAINING COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS ACE INHIBITORS AND/OR NEP INHIBITORS

Title (de)

N-Formyl Hydroxylamin enthaltende Verbindungen als ACE und/oder NEP Inhibitoren

Title (fr)

COMPOSES A BASE DE N-FORMYL HYDROXYLAMINE CONVENANT COMME INHIBITEURS DE L'ENZYME ACE ET/OU DE L'ENDOPEPTIDASE NEP

Publication

EP 0894003 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917889 A

Priority

  • US 9705744 W
  • US 1629596 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738705A1] N-formyl hydroxylamines are provided which have structure (I) wherein R and R<1> are as defined herein and A is a dipeptide derived from an amino acid or is a conformationally restricted dipeptide mimic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/05; C07K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/4353 (2006.01); A61K 31/4365 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 31/553 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 259/06 (2006.01); C07D 267/14 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/06 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 495/14 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 5/023 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/0202 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0599444 A1 19940601 - SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0524553 A1 19930127 - INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]
  • [Y] EP 0655461 A1 19950531 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]
  • [X] EP 0236872 A2 19870916 - HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]
  • [XY] WELLER E.A.: "Design of conformationally constrained angiotensin-converting-enzyme inhibitors", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 125, no. 1, 1984, ORLANDO, FL US, pages 82 - 89, XP000915405
  • [Y] FOURNIE-ZALUSKI M -C ET AL: "NEW BIDENTATES AS FULL INHIBITORS OF ENKEPHALIN-DEGRADING ENZYMES: SYNTHESIS AND ANALGESIC PROPERTIES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, vol. 28, no. 9, 1985, pages 1158 - 1169, XP000906979, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • [X] NISHINO E.A.: "DESIGN OF POTENT REVERSIBLE INHIBITORS OF THERMOLYSIN. PEPTIDES CONTAINING ZINC COORDINATING LIGANDS AND THEIR USE IN AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 18, no. 20, 1979, EASTON, PA US, pages 4340 - 4347, XP002144002
  • See also references of WO 9738705A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738705 A1 19971023; AU 2609497 A 19971107; AU 715451 B2 20000203; CA 2251292 A1 19971023; EP 0894003 A1 19990203; EP 0894003 A4 20001004; JP 2000511882 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060725

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030602

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/05 A, 7C 07K 5/02 B

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981005

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE