Global Patent Index - EP 0894022 B1

EP 0894022 B1 2000-09-06 - BINDING FOR SNOWBOARDS

Title (en)

BINDING FOR SNOWBOARDS

Title (de)

BINDUNG FÜR SNOWBOARDS

Title (fr)

FIXATION POUR PLANCHES A NEIGE

Publication

EP 0894022 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97913967 A

Priority

  • AT 9700059 W
  • AT 51396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734667A2] The invention relates to a binding for snowboards and the like, comprising binding base plates (1a, 1b) which are attached to the snowboard, two binding carrier plates (2a, 2b) which are provided with fastening devices each to be fastened to a shoe of the snowboard user. Holding members (3a, 3b) are provided on the binding base plates (1a, 1b) and are constructed to hold the binding carrier plates (2a, 2b) but to release said plates when there is a predetermined release force. A connection member is provided for automatic detachment of the other binding carrier plate (2a, 2b) from the binding base plate (1a, 1b) when one binding carrier plate (2a, 2b) is detached. Reliable release is achieved by the provision of guide members (8a, 8b, 13a, 13b) on the binding base plates (1a, 1b) which only release the binding carrier plate (2a, 2b) in the longitudinal direction of the snowboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A63C 10/12 (2012.01); A63C 10/14 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/12 (2013.01); A63C 10/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734667 A2 19970925; WO 9734667 A3 19971113; AT 404675 B 19990125; AT A51396 A 19980615; AU 2142597 A 19971010; CA 2248988 A1 19970925; DE 59702317 D1 20001012; EP 0894022 A2 19990203; EP 0894022 B1 20000906; JP 2000506757 A 20000606; US 6209904 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-03-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702317 20001012

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991112

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE