Global Patent Index - EP 0894032 B1

EP 0894032 B1 2000-07-12 - DEVICE FOR SHAPING WORKPIECES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SHAPING WORKPIECES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERFORMEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE FACONNAGE DE PIECES

Publication

EP 0894032 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933377 A

Priority

  • DE 19614517 A
  • EP 9604176 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19614517A1] A device for shaping plate-like workpieces which can be clamped between a first and a second tool uses an hour-glass shaped roller as bending tool. The second tool has a retaining surface which offsets the opposite vertical side surfaces of the tools relative to each other by a horizontal dimension X which corresponds to maximum five times the thickness of the plate-like workpiece. The second tool with the retaining surface is chamfered to form another vertical surface in the area A in which the plate-like workpiece is shaped into a corner and in which the tool does not cover the workpiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 19/04; B21D 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19614517 A1 19971016; AT 194519 T 20000715; AT 3251 U2 19991227; EP 0894032 A1 19990203; EP 0894032 B1 20000712; US 6047585 A 20000411; WO 9738806 A1 19971023

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100924

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-15 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20030907

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: "ACF" ENGINEERING & AUTOMATION GMBH

2002-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-02 [29U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-10-02 [29W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ACF ENGINEERING & AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20000713

2001-07-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ACF ENGINEERING & AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-09-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ACF ENGINEERING & AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB LI

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194519 T 20000715

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990517

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981112

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB LI