Global Patent Index - EP 0894052 B1

EP 0894052 B1 2000-03-22 - FORM WITH DETACHABLE CARD, SUBSTRATE AND MULTILAYER MATERIAL, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SUCH A FORM

Title (en)

FORM WITH DETACHABLE CARD, SUBSTRATE AND MULTILAYER MATERIAL, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SUCH A FORM

Title (de)

FORMULAR MIT HERAUSTRENNBARER KARTE, TRÄGERMATERIAL, MEHRSCHICHTMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

FORMULAIRE AVEC CARTE SEPARABLE, SUBSTRAT, MATERIAU MULTICOUCHE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT FORMULAIRE

Publication

EP 0894052 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937403 A

Priority

  • CH 9700335 W
  • CH 234096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813213A1] This invention concerns a form (1) which has an integrated card (3) which can be detached from it. A substrate material (2) is glued to the back of the form at least partly covering the area of the card (3). This substrate material (2) has both a substrate layer (21) and a peeling adhesive layer (22) which loses its stickiness upon being detached. The card (3) is a punched product which is held in the form (1) by the substrate layer (21). The peeling adhesive layer (22) has its normal properties with respect to the substrate layer (21) - when separated from it upon detaching the card (3), it (22) stays with the card (3). As the surface layer of the detached card (3), it can be written or printed upon, even if the back of the card is plasticized by a film (23) embedded in the substrate material. The writing or imprint can no longer easily be modified through the peeling adhesive layer (22). This makes the card considerably more tamper-proof than earlier cards. Designing the card as a luggage tag is an interesting application. The invention also concerns a substrate material (2) or a completely integrated multilayer material for a form (1) of the previously described kind as well as a process for production.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10; B42D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/02 (2006.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/027 (2013.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); Y10T 428/149 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813213 A1 19980402; AT 190915 T 20000415; AU 4008297 A 19980417; DE 29723325 U1 19981015; DE 59701316 D1 20000427; EP 0894052 A1 19990203; EP 0894052 B1 20000322; NO 324208 B1 20070910; NO 991434 A 19990525; NO 991434 D0 19990324; US 6328340 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FOFITEC A.G.

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701316 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190915 T 20000415

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE