Global Patent Index - EP 0894072 B1

EP 0894072 B1 2000-02-16 - INFLATABLE PACKAGING

Title (en)

INFLATABLE PACKAGING

Title (de)

AUFBLASBARE VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE GONFLABLE

Publication

EP 0894072 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97908433 A

Priority

  • FR 9604685 A
  • IB 9700332 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2747108A1] An inflatable packaging including a valve (15) between two flexible sheets extending at least partially inside the walls and communicating the inside of the packaging with the outside thereof via an opening (9). One end (12a) of a tab cut out of one wall of the packaging is located in a window (22a) in a seal (22) joining said wall to the two flexible sheets forming the valve (15). The walls of the valve (15) may be torn and the packaging deflated by grasping said end (12a) of the tab and pulling it leftwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/30 (2006.01); B65D 81/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/052 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9523742 A1 19950908 - RISGALLA ERIC [CH], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2747108 A1 19971010; FR 2747108 B1 19980703; AU 2039697 A 19971029; DE 69701311 D1 20000323; DE 69701311 T2 20001026; EP 0894072 A1 19990203; EP 0894072 B1 20000216; ES 2143852 T3 20000516; JP 2000508274 A 20000704; WO 9737905 A1 19971016

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040403

2005-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040403

2004-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143852 T3

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701311 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALK PAK HOLDING NV

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980929

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT