Global patent index - EP 0894157 B1

EP 0894157 B1 2000-01-19 - ELECTROFORMING METHOD, ELECTROFORMING MANDREL AND ELECTROFORMED PRODUCT

Title (en)

ELECTROFORMING METHOD, ELECTROFORMING MANDREL AND ELECTROFORMED PRODUCT

Title (de)

ELEKTROFORMUNGSVERFAHREN, FORM FÜR DIE ELEKTROFORMUNG UND ELEKTROFORMIERTES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET MATRICE D'ELECTROFORMAGE ET PRODUIT AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 0894157 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97917482 A

Priority

  • NL 9700203 W
  • NL 1002908 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740213A1] In an electroforming method for making metal products (10) having a pattern of openings (9) separated by dykes (8) using a mandrel in an electroplating bath, metal from the bath is deposited on at least two electrically mutually insulated regions. Said regions comprise at least one main pattern (3) for product dykes (8) to be formed, which main pattern (3) is electrically insulated from at least one ancillary pattern (5) for a reinforcement (7) to be formed. In the method according to the invention, first the ancillary pattern (5) is connected to a current source in order to form reinforcement (7) thereon and in order to effect an electrical connection between the ancillary pattern (5) and the main pattern (3) by means of the growing metal. During the continuation of the method, reinforcement (7) is thickened and the product dykes (8) are formed. A strong product having different thicknesses is therefore obtained in one step. A mandrel suitable for use in the method is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 1/10; C25D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/08 (2006.01); C25D 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/10 (2013.01); C25D 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740213 A1 19971030; AU 2578297 A 19971112; DE 69701189 D1 20000224; DE 69701189 T2 20000621; EP 0894157 A1 19990203; EP 0894157 B1 20000119; NL 1002908 C2 19971021

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701189

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990323

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981013

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL