Global Patent Index - EP 0894180 B1

EP 0894180 B1 2000-11-02 - NOVEL OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE FOR A DELIMITED BUILDING SPACE

Title (en)

NOVEL OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE FOR A DELIMITED BUILDING SPACE

Title (de)

ÖFFNUNGS- / SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN BEGRENZTEN RAUM EINES GEBÄUDES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE-FERMETURE D'UN TYPE NOUVEAU POUR UN ESPACE LIMITE DE BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0894180 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97918203 A

Priority

  • FR 9700643 W
  • FR 9604699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738202A2] The invention relates to an opening and closing device for a free building space, for example a slat-type roller blind for a window. Said blind can slide in two side vertical guides (4) and the slats are hooked to each other by hooking systems (7), and comprise along their length a male to female interlocking system. Said device can be lowered or raised to close or open the space, moving between a totally closed position, in which the lower slat rests against a horizontal strut and in which the slats are all interlocked with each other by gravity along the complete length thereof to form a continuous sheet, and a partially or totally open position in which the slats are disengaged by gravity and separated from each other by a space determined by the height of the hooking system (7). The invention is characterised in that certain slats at least of the device comprise a pivoting part to which a small bar mirror (20) is attached on one of the faces thereof. The result is that the bottom floors have maximum natural illumination, while the room remains completely private, and the top floors are illuminated when necessary, by altering the opening angle of the slats, which angle both inhibits and diffuses rays. In both cases regulation of the internal temperature of the building depends on the opening of the slats. When the device is completely closed, the internal surface of the shutter sheet forms a mirror, thereby saving a considerable amount of energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738202 A2 19971016; WO 9738202 A3 19980212; AT 197335 T 20001115; DE 69703442 D1 20001207; DE 69703442 T2 20010621; EP 0894180 A2 19990203; EP 0894180 B1 20001102; ES 2153662 T3 20010301; FR 2747425 A1 19971017; FR 2747425 B1 20001110; US 6119759 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070412

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070412

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-21 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2004-04-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153662 T3

2001-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010203

2001-02-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703442 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2000-11-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197335 T 20001115

2000-08-09 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ASSAAD, ELIE

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ASSAAD, ELIE

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991125

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE