Global patent index - EP 0894223 B1

EP 0894223 B1 2000-07-05 - RADIATION HEATER

Title (en)

RADIATION HEATER

Title (de)

STRAHLUNGSWÄRMEHEIZUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE A CHALEUR RAYONNANTE

Publication

EP 0894223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97919385 A

Priority

  • DE 19615770 A
  • EP 9701951 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2252608A1] The invention relates to a radiation heater with a radiant tube surrounded by a housing which has a reflector region guiding the heat radiation downwards. The radiation heater can also be used in low spaces due to the fact that the structure of the upper reflector region and/or lateral reflector regions adjacent thereto and/or radiation surfaces of the radiant tube is such that the heat radiation emerging from the housing has a distribution curve lowered at the centre below the housing and raised in relation thereto on both sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/22; F24D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/22 (2006.01); F24D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 5/08 (2013.01); F24C 15/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607829 U1 19960801; CA 2252608 A1 19971030; DE 19615770 A1 19971023; EP 0894223 A1 19990203; EP 0894223 B1 20000705; WO 9740319 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010510

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701971

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981120

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB