Global Patent Index - EP 0894282 A4

EP 0894282 A4 2000-07-12 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY AND METHOD

Title (en)

LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY AND METHOD

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND DAZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 0894282 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97918498 A

Priority

  • RU 96107430 A
  • US 9705423 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739380A1] A liquid crystal display has a first substrate plate (1) and a second substrate plate (2), and a liquid crystal layer disposed between the plates (1) and (2). A polarizing coating (8) or (9), having molecules of one or more organic dyes capable of forming a lyotropic liquid crystalline phase, is formed overlying a selected surface of each plate (1) and (2). Orientation of the polarizing coating (8) or (9) is obtained by applying a force to the dye molecules when in the liquid crystal phase and subsequently converting the liquid crystal phase to a solid film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13 (2006.01); C09B 19/00 (2006.01); G02B 5/30 (2006.01); G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); G02F 1/1337 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133528 (2013.01); G02B 5/3016 (2013.01); G02F 1/133516 (2013.01); G02F 1/133711 (2013.01); G02F 2001/133538 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] WO 9428073 A1 19941208 - RUSSIAN TECHNOLOGY GROUP [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9616015 A1 19960530 - RUSSIAN TECHNOLOGY GROUP [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 093 (P - 838) 6 March 1989 (1989-03-06)
  • See also references of WO 9739380A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9739380 A1 19971023; AU 2659197 A 19971107; CN 1111755 C 20030618; CN 1218557 A 19990602; EP 0894282 A1 19990203; EP 0894282 A4 20000712; JP 2001504238 A 20010327; JP 2006048078 A 20060216; JP 3755831 B2 20060315; JP 4152979 B2 20080917; RU 2120651 C1 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPTIVA, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPTIVA, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981023

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE